Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/16/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau - check no. 8969. | | |
05/16/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 07-10894 |
05/16/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings. | | |
06/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. | | 07-13045 |
07/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Docketing Statement and to Comply with NRAP 9(a.) To date, appellant has failed to comply with the notice. Docketing statement and request transcripts due: 10 days. We caution appellant's counsel that failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | | 07-16134 |
08/07/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 07-17367 |
08/21/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/7/06 and 11/13/06. To Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Nos. 48725 and 49461 (not consolidated) [07-18511] | | |
09/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 07-20829 |
11/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Nos. 48725/49461 - cases are not consolidated. | | 07-24428 |
11/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 48725/49461. | | 07-24430 |
11/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. The parties' stipulation to consolidate Docket No. 48725 with Docket No. 49461 is approved. The clerk shall amend the caption to reflect the consolidation of these two appeals. The parties' stipulation to extend the time for filing the opening brief and appendix is approved. Appellant: November 21, 2007, to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Mr. Kangas: 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Nos. 48725/49461 (07-24869). | | |
11/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Nos. 48725/49461. (07-25463) | | |
11/29/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/07/06 and 11/13/06. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-25804). | | |
12/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26338). | | |
12/06/2007 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26344). RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/26/07. | | |
12/06/2007 | Appendix | Received Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 13. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26352). RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/26/07. | | |
12/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Thirty Pages). Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26357). | | |
12/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix). Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26358). | | |
12/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Received Notice. Notice of Errata to the Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26411). RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/26/07. | | |
12/06/2007 | Brief | Received Amended Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-26412). RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/26/07. | | |
12/19/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix, Vols. 1 through 13. Nos. 48725/49461.(07-27503) | | |
12/19/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for Motion for Leave to file Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461. (07-27504) | | |
12/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk to return, unfiled, appellant's briefs, appendix, and notice of errata submitted on December 6, 2007. Opening Brief of no more than 60 pages due: 15 days. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-28002). | | |
12/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondents to File Respondents' Opening Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (07-28352). | | |
01/03/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief due: 1/18/08 - no more than 60 pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-00274). | | |
01/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 48725/49461. (08-01755) | | |
01/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 13. Nos. 48725/49461. (08-01758) | | |
02/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Expansion of N.R.A.P. 28(g) for Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-02873). | | |
02/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents shall file answering briefs not to exceed 60 pages in length. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-03896). | | |
02/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Christianne Yates. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-04255). | | |
02/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-04265). | | |
02/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (Joint Appendix 14 and 15). Nos. 48725/49461 (08-04267). | | |
02/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Answering Brief of Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-04268). | | |
02/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Receipt of Copy - Respondent Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.' Answering Brief and Joint Appendix - Vols. 14 & 15. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-05225). | | |
03/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Brief due: March 31, 2008. Nos. 48725/49461. (08-07038) | | |
03/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-07982). | | |
04/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-8851). | | |
04/14/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Approving Stipulation and Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: April 23, 2008. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-09183). | | |
04/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to File Reply Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-09228). | | |
04/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-09339). | | |
04/18/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Disapproving Stipulation as Moot. The parties' April 15, 2008, stipulation to extend the time to file the reply brief is disapproved as moot. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-09719). | | |
04/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File Reply Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-10379). | | |
04/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File Reply Brief. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-10385). | | |
05/01/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File Reply Brief served on respondents. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-10843). | | |
05/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: May 23, 2008. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-11839). | | |
05/13/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Issued Letter to Attoney Douglas Gerrard - returning unfiled "Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File Reply Brief" as untimely. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-12000). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the letter.] | | |
05/14/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Issue Letter to Attorney Scott Taylor - returning unfiled "Respondent Christianne Yates' Joinder in Fidelilty's Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time in which to File a Reply Brief" as untimely. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-12146). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the letter.] | | |
05/16/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Issued Letter to Attorney Scott R. Taylor Respondent Christianne Yates' Joinder in Fidelity's Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to File Reply Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-12451). | | |
05/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Yates' Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-13374). | | |
05/28/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. Joint Appendix-Vols. 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, and 21. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-13376). | | |
05/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-13377). | | |
05/28/2008 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-13379). (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 06/12/08). | | |
05/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Notice of Errata to the Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-13483). (STRICKEN PER ORDER 06/12/08). | | |
06/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. (1) Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages: (2) Countermotion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief; and (3) Alternative Countermotion to File Supplemental Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-14108). | | |
06/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent Christianne Yates' Joinder in Fidelity's (1) Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages: (2) Countermotion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief; and (3) Alternative Countermotion to File Supplemental Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461. (08-14494) | | |
06/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Appellant's motion to file an 85-page reply brief is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, appellant's reply brief to Fidelity's answering brief, and stirke the errata to appellant's reply brief filed on May 29, 2008. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 20 days. fn1[Fidelity's countermotion is denied as moot.] Nos. 48725/49461 (08-14918). | | |
06/12/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461. | | |
06/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. 1) Opposition to Countermotion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief; and 2) Opposition to Alternative Countermotion to File Supplemental Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461. (08-15384) | | |
07/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-17137). | | |
07/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to Republish the Statement of the Facts. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-17138). | | |
07/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Addendum to Motion for Leave to Republish the Statement of the Facts. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-17140). | | |
07/07/2008 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-17258). (FILED PER ORDER 09/11/08). | | |
07/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to Replubish the Statement of the Facts and Alternative Countermotion to File Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18007). | | |
07/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18011). | | |
07/15/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. -Respondent Christianne Yates' Joinder in Fidelity's: (1) Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages; and (2) Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to Replubish the Statement of the Facts and Alternative Countermotion to File Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18155). | | |
07/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to Republish the Statement of Facts. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18890). | | |
07/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18891). | | |
07/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Fidelity's Motion for Leave to File its Amended and Restated Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48715/49461 (08-18893). | | |
07/22/2008 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Fidelity's Amended and Restated Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18894). (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 09/11/08). | | |
07/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to Republish the Statement of Facts. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-19505). | | |
07/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-19506). | | |
07/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. Respondent Christianne Yates' Joinder in Fidelity's: (1) Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to Republish the Statement of Facts.; and (2) Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-19508). | | |
09/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have ten days from the date of this order to file and serve the republished statement of facts. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on July 7, 2008. Fidelity and Yates shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to file supplemental answering briefs responding only to appellant's republished statement of facts. fn1[In light of the foregoing, appellant's opposed motion for leave to file a reply to Fidelity's opposition to appellant's motion for leave to republish the statement of facts, appellant's opposed motion for leave to file a reply to Fidelity's opposition to appellant's motion for leave to file a brief in excess of 30 pages, and Fidelity's motion for leave to file an amended and restated opposition to appellant's motion to file a reply brief in excess of 30 pages are denied as moot. The clerk shall return Fidelity's amended and restated opposition, received on July 22, 2008, unfiled.] Nos. 48725/49461 (08-23537). | | |
09/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Fidelity's Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-17258). | | |
09/11/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Fidelity's Amended and Restated Opposition to the Forrest Trust's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-18894). | | |
10/07/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. To Roger P. Croteau, Esq. and David T. Spurlock, Jr. Esq.. Returning unfiled the duplicate Reply Brief received 9/25/08. (Brief was previously filed on 9/11/08). Nos. 48725/49461 (08-25918) | | |
10/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. The Arvis C. and Anna L. Forrest Trust's Republished Statement of the Facts. (In response to order filed 9/11/08). Nos. 48725/49461 (08-26355). | | |
10/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Respondent Christianne Yates' Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-26417). | | |
10/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Respondent Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.'s Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 48725/49461 (08-26419). | | |
02/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (SNP09-RP/MD/KP) Nos. 48725/49461. | | 09-04796 |
03/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Short Continuance of Oral Arguments. Nos. 48725/49461. (09-05618) | | |
03/12/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant the motion to reschedule oral argument. We vacate the argument presently scheduled for April 9, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on the next available argument date. Nos. 48725/49461 (09-06388). | | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 8, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (SNP09-RP/MD/KP) Nos. 48725/49461. | | 09-08619 |
05/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 48725/49461. | | 09-13030 |
06/08/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP09-RP/MD/KP | | |
09/28/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP Nos. 48725/49461. | | 09-23581 |
10/20/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 48725/49461. (09-25633) | | |
10/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 48725/49461. (09-25636) | | |
11/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd - check no. 15188. Nos. 48725/49461. | | |
11/03/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice issued 10/20/09 addressed to David T. Spurlock Jr.. Per USPS, "return to sender, attempted not known". No forwarding address. Nos. 48725/49461. (09-26844) | | |
11/25/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 48725/49461 (09-28760). | | |
12/11/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 11/25/09 addressed to David T. Spurlock Jr.. Per USPS, "return to sender, attempted not known". No forwarding address. Nos. 48725/49461. (09-30119) | | |
12/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 09-29902 |
12/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/06/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 12/22/09 addressed to David T. Spurlock Jr.. Per USPS, "return to sender, attempted not known". No forwarding address. Nos. 48725/49461. (10-00333) | | |
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2009. | | 09-29902 |