Case Information: 49460 | |||
Short Caption: | DE LONG VS. PHELPS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47645 , 49695 , 50663 , 58838 , 60983 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0600289 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/16/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/16/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-10880 | |
05/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Request for Order that DeLong be Prohibited from filing any more Appeals in this Case until after a Final Judgment is Entered Following Trial in District Court. | 07-11628 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[We deny respondent's request that this court prohibit appellant from filing any appeals until a final judgment is rendered.] fn4[In light of this order appellant does not need to file his civil proper person appeal statement, mailed to him on May 16, 2007.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12523 | |
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Amended Notice of Appeal. | 07-12714 | |
06/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Amended Notice of Appeal. No action on appellant's submission is necessary. If appellant chooses to file a petition for writ of mandamus, it will be docketed under a new docket number. | 07-13903 | |
07/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-13593 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2007. | 07-13593 |