Case Information: 53367 | |||
Short Caption: | KLAUSNER VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246240 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05571 | |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-07947 | |
04/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-08432 | |
04/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/11/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 28, 2009. | 09-08432 |