judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GORDON VS. GORDON

Case Information: 32130
Short Caption:GORDON VS. GORDONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D200707Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/16/1998 / Brennan, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/10/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/10/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
04/16/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: James A. Brennan, Senior Judge. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/17/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
04/17/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
04/21/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Transcription Video Services.
04/23/1998Other Other. Filed certified copies of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on 4/21/98.
04/28/1998Other Other. Filed Request for Voluntary Dismissal.
05/13/1998Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. "We hereby dismiss this appeal."
05/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On May 13, 1998, we filed an order dismissing this appeal. However, to date, the required filing fee has not been paid. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions.
08/21/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. To date, appellant has failed to comply with the notice issued on April 17, 1998, or the order entered on May 22, 1998, or otherwise to communicate with this court concerning the filing fee. Accordingly, we conclude that the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel is warranted. Attorney H. Stan Johnson and the law firm of Oxman & Jaroscak shall each personally pay the sum of $200.00 dollars to the Supreme Court Law Library and shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, filed an affidavit or certificate of payment with the clerk of this court. Futher, appellant shall, within the same time period, submit the $200.00 filing fee to the clerk of this court. Appellant's counsel are cautioned that failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of addtitional sanctions, including but not limited to, referral to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. 00-14590
09/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of H. Stan Johnson/Proof of Payment of Sanctions. 00-15962
10/04/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. The law firm of Oxman & Jaroscak has failed to submit the $200 sanction imposed by the August 21, 2000, order. Accordingly, they shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, pay the sum of $200 to the Supreme Court Law Library and file with the clerk of this court an affidavit or certificate setting forth the date and manner of payment. Further, within 10 days of the date of this order, appellant shall pay the clerk of this court the $200 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including, but not limited to, referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada. 00-17612
10/30/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cohen, Johnson, Day, Jones & Royal--check no. 6647.
11/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of R. Brian Oxman and Request for Reconsideration (with enclosed check no. 2033 in the amount of $200--forwarded to Law Library). 00-20659
12/02/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 21, 2003, this court entered an order imposing sanctions against appellant's counsel. Attorney R. Brian Oxman has filed a motion requesting this court to reconsider the imposition of the sanction. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 03-20014