judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (HOWARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53366
Short Caption:BROWN (HOWARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39795 , 42784 , 53840 , 56769 , 59695 , 59696 , 64199 , 64432 , 79986
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178401 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-05569
03/04/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/20/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. 09-07114
04/27/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 20, 2009. (Order Denying Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea.) 09-10409
05/14/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. 09-12005
05/14/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/04/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn2[Although appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person, we have reviewed all documents that he has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 10-03117
03/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-04235
03/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. 10-04235