Case Information: 49480 | |||
Short Caption: | VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA VS. DIST. CT. (FINDLAY AUTOMOTIVE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A490654 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gage & Gage, LLP--check no. 10399. | ||
05/21/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-11112 | |
05/21/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 1 of 2. | 07-11113 | |
05/21/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 2 of 2 | 07-11114 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Saitta sat in district court proceedings. | 07-11177 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. (1) Findlay's Partial Opposition to Volkswagen's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed on or about 09/25/06; (2) Whitmore's Reply to Findlay's Partial Opposition to Volkswagen's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed on or about 10/11/06; (3) Volkswagen's Reply in Support of its Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed on or about 12/27/06; and (4) Findlay's Opposition to Volkswagen's Motion for Reconsideration filed on or about 02/28/07. Due Date: 10 days | 07-11175 | |
05/29/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. | 07-11662 | |
05/31/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Appendix, Volume 3. | 07-11946 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn5[We deny as moot real party in interest Findlay Automotive of Nevada, LLC's motion to strike.] NNP07-WM/RP/JH | 07-12538 | |
06/08/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Martin J. Kravitz of Kravitz, Schnitzer firm associates as counsel for appellant. A Substitution of Attorneys is pending, and will be filed with the Court. | 07-12587 | |
06/12/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Petitioner's Consent to Real Parties in Interest's Motion to Strike. | 07-12792 | |
07/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-13558 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |