Case Information: 32051 | |||
Short Caption: | MONTANIO (GENE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C111558 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/06/1998 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
03/27/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
03/31/1998 | Other | Other. Voluntary recusal of Justice Maupin from participation in this matter (trial court judge). | ||
04/21/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall, within 120 days from the date of this order, transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | ||
04/27/1998 | Other | Other. Filed Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 3/27/98. | ||
08/06/1998 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 5 (copies). | ||
08/06/1998 | Other | Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day. | ||
08/06/1998 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/28/1998 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Requesting Extension of Time (Received the original only). | ||
10/16/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received int his matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-RR/CY/NB | 00-18274 | |
11/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-18411 | |
11/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2000. | 00-18411 |