judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARIA JANET MOFFIT-SHOEMAKER V. UNITED STATES, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1151
Short Caption:MARIA JANET MOFFIT-SHOEMAKER V. UNITED STATES, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2019-10Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaria Janet Moffit-Shoemaker YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
AppelleeOlympic Moving and Storage Inc.N
Frank S. SwainNY
AppelleeWheaton Van Lines Inc.N
Frank S. SwainNY
AppelleeLawrence A. Costich N
Parker J. Lavin NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/23/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
09/23/2010TMC - OTSC - (LODGED) ROTSC
10/15/2010RECEIVED - customer's receipt
10/19/2010RECEIVED - aplt's response to court order (no certificate of service)
11/30/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall file APPELLANT'S LODGED RESPONSE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED.f See DC App. R. 4(a)(1). (OBNBKG) (kt)
11/30/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
11/30/2010DISMISSED
12/14/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
12/15/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration
01/31/2011On consideration of appellant's motion for reconsideration of this court's order dismissing the appeal as having been untimely filed, it is ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is denied. (OBTEKG)
02/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED