Case Information: 53344 | |||
Short Caption: | ALFORD, JR. (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C239412 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/05/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05232 | |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-07112 | |
06/05/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-14157 | |
06/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/19/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 6/5/09 addressed to Donald J. Alford. Per NDOC and stamp on envelope, Mr. Alford has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 09-15287 | |
09/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-21476 | |
09/15/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 9/3/09 addressed to Donald J. Alford. Per NDOC and stamp on envelope, Mr. Alford has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 09-15287 | |
09/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-22545 | |
09/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/07/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2009. | 09-22545 | |
10/14/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 9/29/09 addressed to Donald J. Alford. Per NDOC and stamp on envelope, Mr. Alford has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 09-25051 |