Case Information: 53345 | |||
Short Caption: | MITCHELL (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48840 , 52865 , 54945 , 56891 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 05C214736 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/23/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05235 | |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order filed on 3/3/09.) | 09-06714 | |
03/24/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 3/3/09. | 09-07440 | |
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08511 | |
06/23/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. | 09-15548 | |
06/23/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED with directions to the district court to correct the clerical error in the judgment of conviction." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-27113 | |
12/01/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28443 | |
12/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2009. | 09-28443 |