Case Information: 53335 | |||
Short Caption: | HUGHES (MICHAEL) VS. STATE C/W 52967 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 52967 *, 53335 | Related Case(s): | 52967 , 56131 , 57822 , 60457 , 61392 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C223092 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/01/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. HUGHES - C223092 for MICHAEL RAY HUGHES, Defendant | 09-05083 | |
02/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Supplemental Record on due: 30 days. | 09-05736 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 25, 2009. Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion for Modification of Sentence and Motion to Appear Telephonically. | 09-07979 | |
04/01/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-08236 | |
04/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 40 days. | 09-30037 | |
01/06/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/21/07. | 10-00315 | |
01/15/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Not certified. Proceedings: 8/21/07. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | 10-01285 | |
01/15/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 2. | 10-01329 | |
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG Nos. 52967/53335. | 10-03065 | |
02/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. Nos. 52967/53335 (10-04748). | ||
02/22/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Change of Address for Appellant Michael Hughes. Nos. 52967/53335 (10-04753). | ||
04/08/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 52967/53335 (10-09096). | ||
04/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Notice of Appeal. Nos. 52967/53335. (10-10530) | ||
06/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Nos. 52967/53335. | 10-16307 | |
07/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-18123 | |
07/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/24/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 17, 2010. | 10-18123 |