Case Information: 53346 | |||
Short Caption: | ACEVEDO-BONILLA (MAGALI) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C239574 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-05238 | |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. Appellant Acevedo-Bonilla | 09-09819 | |
05/05/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Representing appellant: T. Augustas Claus. | 09-11116 | |
05/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60 days). | 09-11329 | |
05/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Approving Substitution and Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Denue as counsel for appellant. Mr. Claus shall have until June 29, 2009, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 09-12021 | |
06/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-14958 | |
06/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: 10 days to file supplemental transcript request form. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due July 30, 2009. | 09-15869 | |
07/02/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/24/08 and 12/02/08, 12/04/09, and 2/11/09. Court Reporter: Beverly Sigurnik. Filed in district court on: May 27, 2009. (In response to order filed 6/26/09). | 09-16358 | |
08/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (7) days. | 09-18886 | |
08/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 5 days. | 09-19266 | |
08/18/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-20015 | |
08/18/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 and 2. | 09-20016 | |
09/08/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-21735 | |
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-03029 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04268 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04268 |