Case Information: 49463 | |||
Short Caption: | GOODMAN VS. SKOLNIK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-10915 | |
05/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Waive Filing Fee for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-10916 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn5[Petitioner has filed a motion requesting that this court waive the filing fee. We deny the motion, and note that petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee constitutes an independent basis on which to deny his petition.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12536 | |
07/24/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file petitioner's motion provisionally received on June 27, 2007. We grant the motion, and we direct the clerk of this court to file petitioner's rehearing petition, provisionally received on June 27, 2007. No filing fee on rehearing is due.] | 07-16140 | |
07/24/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. | 07-14040 | |
07/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Waive Filing Fees for Petition for Rehearing. | 07-14042 | |
08/21/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-16909 | |
08/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |