judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. CLAIR

Case Information: 49462
Short Caption:SMITH VS. CLAIRCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A453082Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/05/2007 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/05/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/16/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/16/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10897
05/16/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days. 07-10898
05/24/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Greenberg Traurig - check no. 2860.
05/29/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11696
05/30/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/06/06, 03/13/06, 03/15/06, 10/30/06, 01/02/07, and 01/29/07. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. 07-11869
05/30/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Transcripts. 07-11870
05/31/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Docketing Statement. 07-11959
06/05/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. 07-12224
06/14/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13031
06/21/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 03/06/06, 03/15/06, 01/02/07 and 01/29/07. Court Reporters: Carlaya Lewis and Rachelle Hamilton. 07-13636
06/22/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-13723
06/27/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Transcripts. 07-14070
08/13/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 20, 2007. 07-17789
11/02/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-24095
11/30/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Court Reporter Rachelle Hamilton: 30 days to deliver the requested transcripts and to file a certificate with this court. Appellant: 60 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Fn1The clerk shall attach a copy of the transcript request form to this order.] 07-25884
12/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. (1) "Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice" filed 10/23/02; (2) "The Ceci Defendants' Motion, on Order Shortening Time, For Good Faith Determination" filed 02/28/06; (3) "Order Re: Good Faith Determination" filed 04/11/06; and (4) "Stipulation and Order to Dismiss All Claims Against Michael Nunley and Century 21 Moneyworld with Prejudice" filed 02/22/07. Due Date: 10 days. 07-26103
12/11/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Certified copies of (1) "Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice" filed 10/23/02; (2) "The Ceci Defendants' Motion, on Order Shortening Time, For Good Faith Determination" filed 02/28/06; (3) "Order Re: Good Faith Determination" filed 04/11/06; and (4) "Stipulation and Order to Dismiss All Claims Against Michael Nunley and Century 21 Moneyworld with Prejudice" filed 02/22/07 07-26876
12/21/2007Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 3176 returned to Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Filing fee previously paid.)
12/21/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Notice of Appeal. 07-27666
01/09/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/07/07, 05/14/07, and 07/18/07. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. 08-00582
01/24/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/7/07. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. 08-01878
01/31/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 28, 2008. 08-02501
03/04/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-05373
03/04/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 4. 08-05374
03/10/2008MotionFiled Motion. Philip T. Varricchio of the Law Firm of Muije & Varricchio Notice of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel of Record for Respondent, Shron Clair. 08-05948
04/01/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 21, 2008. 08-08137
04/24/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-10236
04/24/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental. 08-10238
05/29/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-13551
06/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Counsel to Withdraw and Regarding Transcripts. We grant Mr. Varricchio's motion to withdraw as counsel for respondents. The clerk shall remove Mr. Varricchio and the law firm of Muije & Varricchio as counsel for respondents on this court's docket. Ms. Hamilton is not obligated to file the requested transcripts in this court. 08-14225
08/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted for decision on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order 08-20297
08/05/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "REVERSED AND REMAND this case for further proceedings consistent with this order." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-03199
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04635
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2009. 09-04635