judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUCHANAN VS. PARROW

Case Information: 49457
Short Caption:BUCHANAN VS. PARROWCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0500364Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Piscevich, MargoSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/16/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Galloway & Jensen - check no. 19808.
05/16/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10856
05/31/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11934
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margo Piscevich. 07-12345
07/11/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-15098
07/23/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 07-16072
07/25/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service for Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. 07-16353
07/26/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 07-16452
07/26/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.