Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
05/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copies of d.c. docket entries, Judgment of Conviction, d.c. minutes and exhibit list. | | 07-11104 |
05/18/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice A. William Maupin and Justice Michael L. Douglas sat in district court proceedings. | | 07-11105 |
05/25/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 18. | | 07-11647 |
06/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (w/case appeal statement.) | | 07-12978 |
06/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-13147 |
06/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to File Transcripts: due: July 29, 2007. | | 07-13869 |
07/18/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | | 07-15637 |
07/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal. | | 07-16184 |
07/31/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. District Court Clerk: Supplemental Record due 10 days. | | 07-16756 |
08/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-17364 |
08/09/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/8/07; 3/12/07; 3/13/07 & 5/10/07. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. (submitted by Clark County Clerk) | | 07-17628 |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Time for filing the Opening Brief extended to October 3, 2007. | | 07-17969 |
09/21/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 19. | | 07-20916 |
10/05/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-22019 |
10/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief due: 90 days. | | 07-22456 |
01/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-00580 |
01/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time. Appellant: 90 days to file the opening brief. | | 08-01410 |
04/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Opening Brief. | | 08-09920 |
04/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have until May 19, 2008, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We note that appellant has now been granted a total extension of 270 days to file the opening brief. Accordingly, no further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extraordinary circumstances and extreme need. | | 08-10338 |
05/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Leave to File Eighty Page Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 08-12893 |
06/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 80 page opening brief received on May 22, 2008. Answering brief due: 60 days.[Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | | 08-14499 |
06/09/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 08-12894 |
08/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 45 Page Answering Brief. | | 08-20842 |
08/12/2008 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. | | 08-20843 |
08/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for excess pages. The clerk shall file the 45-page answering brief received on 8/12/08. Reply brief due: 45 days. | | 08-21760 |
08/22/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-20843 |
10/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Forty Page Appelant's Reply Brief. | | 08-26156 |
10/10/2008 | Brief | Received Reply Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 10/23/08). | | 08-26157 |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 40 page reply brief received on October 10, 2008. | | 08-27223 |
10/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 08-26157 |
05/21/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on July 6, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. EN BANC | | 09-12692 |
06/22/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 09-15517 |
07/06/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
10/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." EN BANC-JH/RP/MC/MG/NS/KP fn7[The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | | 09-25578 |
10/28/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 09-26519 |
11/04/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/16/09). | | |
12/16/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. and Amending Order. Although we deny rehearing, Chappell justifiably complains of an error in the order of affirmance, and we therefore amend the order of affirmance to remove the challenged passage. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the following language from page 18, lines 4-9, of the order of affirmance. fn1[We decline to consider Chappell's proper person documents and direct the clerk of this court to return them, unfiled, to Chappell.] | | 09-30575 |
12/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Remittitur. | | 09-30669 |
12/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Granting Stay of Remittitur. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 2, 2010, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 2, 2010, the remittitur shall issue on March 3, 2010. | | 09-30725 |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Filing of Petition for a Writ of Certiorari. | | 10-05352 |
03/11/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed 2/24/10 and placed on the docket as Case No. 09-9418. | | 10-06468 |
05/11/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | | 10-12197 |
06/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-14569 |
06/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 11, 2010. | | 10-14569 |