Case Information: 49472 | |||
Short Caption: | DANSON VS. DIST. CT. (WOJTECKI) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48659 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0300576 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Glade Hall - check no. 149. | ||
05/18/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-11073 | |
05/18/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-11074 | |
06/22/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 07-13693 | |
07/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-16122 | |
07/24/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Answer due: July 30, 2007. | 07-16206 | |
07/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Answer to Petition for Writ. | 07-16650 | |
09/05/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Applicaton for Suspension of Order Pending Review. | 07-19521 | |
09/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Application for Suspension of Order Pending Review. | 07-19706 | |
09/18/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Impending Action in the District Court. | 07-20590 | |
09/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Stay. We grant petitioners' motion and stay enforcement of the challenged order, as well as any additional enforcement or contempt proceedings in District Court Case No. CV03-00576. fn2[We grant real party in interest's July 30, 2007 motion and direct the clerk to file the answer received on August 3, 2007.] | 07-20962 | |
09/24/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 07-17169 | |
09/24/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Respondent's Appendix. (Copy) (Note: App.1a-1d Aerial Photograph was removed and stored with Exhibits because it could not be scanned.) | 07-17171 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER THE PETITION DENIED." fn6-[In light of this order, our September 24, 2007 stay is vacated.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-10409 | |
05/20/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-10717 | |
05/20/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |