Case Information: 49473 | |||
Short Caption: | NIELSEN VS. NIELSEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0501155 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/04/2007 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of John P. Springgate--check no. 7903. | ||
05/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11075 | |
06/04/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 07-12135 | |
06/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-13100 | |
06/26/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13961 | |
06/26/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-13962 | |
06/29/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-14286 | |
07/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15685 | |
08/07/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-17325 | |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 07-18034 | |
08/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-18544 | |
08/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 07-18863 | |
08/30/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). | 07-19264 | |
08/30/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |