Case Information: 49470 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: STANTON TRUST AGREEMENT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49408 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P054764 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/04/2007 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Cary Colt Payne, Chtd.--check no. 7213. | ||
05/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11060 | |
06/04/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. | 07-12131 | |
06/04/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution of the Orders of the District Court Dispossessing Appellant from her Marital Home which she willing, able & entitled to purchase (filed via fax). | 07-12164 | |
06/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed via fax. | 07-12200 | |
06/04/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed June 4, 2007.We hereby temporarily stay enforcement of the district court order that is the subject of this appeal, pending receipt and consideration of a response to the motion for stay. Respondent: 10 days to file a response to the motion for a stay. After the response is filed, this court will determine if a reply is necessary and whether a permanent stay and the filing of a bond are warranted. | 07-12204 | |
06/06/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-12368 | |
06/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution of the Orders of the District Court Dispossessing Appellant from her Marital Home which she willing, able & entitled to purchase (filed by fax on 6/4/07). | 07-12372 | |
06/07/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. of Entry of this court's order of June 4, 2007. | 07-12456 | |
06/11/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-12686 | |
06/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution. | 07-13015 | |
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 07-13348 | |
07/16/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15384 | |
07/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Stay. Fn2[In light of this order, we vacate the temporary stay entered on June 4, 2007.] | 07-15570 | |
11/09/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Request for a 30 Day Extension. | 07-24513 | |
01/18/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 08-01545 | |
01/25/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-01986 | |
01/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 08-02208 | |
02/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). | 08-03061 | |
02/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |