judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCKINNEY VS. CONSOLIDATED MORTGAGE

Case Information: 49469
Short Caption:MCKINNEY VS. CONSOLIDATED MORTGAGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A490537Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/11/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/18/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Berkley, Gordon & Goldstein, LLP--check no. 13577.
05/18/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11056
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. 07-12308
06/07/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Michael K. Wall of Hutchison & Steffen associates with Robert A. Goldstein of Berkley, Gordon & Goldstein as counsel for appellant. 07-12467
06/07/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12475
06/11/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. for notice of appearance. 07-12652
06/21/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13609
06/25/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certicate of Mailing served upon Settlement Judge Israel Kunin. 07-13819
07/16/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McCullough, Perez & Associates, Ltd.--check no. 6326.
07/16/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 07-15376
07/23/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 07-16023
07/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Docketing Statement. 07-16024
07/31/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-16838
08/09/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 4, 2007. 07-17585
09/06/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-19620
09/13/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondent: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20264
09/26/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-21269
09/27/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Transcripts requested: 06/06/07. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 07-21348
10/01/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 07-21652
10/16/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. Ms. Vincent has filed a notice indicating that she has served a copy of the transcript on counsel for the parties to this appeal. The recent amendments do not apply to this appeal, as it was docketed in this court on May 18, 2007, and the recent amendments apply only to appeals docketed on or after July 1, 2007. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcript listed in Ms. Vincent's notice. Appellant shall include a copy of the June 6, 2007, transcript in the appendix to the opening brief, if necessary, and Ms. Vincent is not obligated to file a copy of the transcript in this court. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 07-22803
12/10/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 11, 2008. 07-26798
01/14/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-00921
01/16/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-01187
01/18/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall filed the appendix received on January 16, 2008. Respondent/cross-appellant: 30 days to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening biref on cross-appeal. 08-01449
01/18/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 - 3. 08-01188
02/20/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 08-04041
02/20/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 08-04042
03/17/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 17, 2008. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 08-06625
04/21/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 08-09822
04/21/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. (Table of Contents, Authorities Cited, Case Law, and Attorney's Certificate). 08-09874
05/15/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 08-12274
07/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted for decision on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-17693
07/11/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/03/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MC/MG/NS 08-30785
12/30/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-31173
12/30/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/12/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 6, 2009. 08-31173