judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLINS (LEROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49475
Short Caption:COLLINS (LEROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52285
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C082619Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/06/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/18/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/18/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-11093
05/22/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order of Dismissal (Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) filed 5/16/07. Due Date: 10 days 07-11256
05/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-11497
05/30/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order of Dismissal Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on May 16, 2007. 07-11836
02/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. 08-02850
03/06/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. 08-05713
03/06/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/26/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[Because the district court dismissed the petition without prejudice, appellant may refile his petition after redrafting it to include sufficient factual allegations to support his request for relief.] fn4[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-07409
04/22/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-08122
04/22/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2008. 08-08122