Case Information: 49464 | |||
Short Caption: | NEWPORT MANAGEMENT VS. DIST. CT. (KOHLRAUTZ) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A516758 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lawrence J. Semenza, Ltd.--check no. 5097. | ||
05/17/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-10938 | |
05/17/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 07-10940 | |
05/17/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Deleted all real parties in interest and their counsel except Kohlrautz and Weber.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 07-10989 | |
05/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioners shall have 10 days from the date that real parties in interest's answer is served to file any reply. | 07-11454 | |
06/27/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Defendant/Real Party in Interest, Tracy O'Reilly Kohnrautz' Answer Brief to the Writ of Mandamus. | 07-14091 | |
06/27/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Defendant/Real Party in Interest, Tracy O'Reilly Kohnrautz' Appendix in Support of her Answer Brief to the Writ of Mandamus. | 07-14093 | |
07/02/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Christopher J. Wever, Receiver's Appendix to the Response Brief to the Application for Writ of Mandamus filed by Newport Management, Inc. UNFILED AND RETURNED PER ORDER 08/17/07. | 07-14462 | |
07/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Defendant Christopher J. Weber's Motion to Appeal and file Briefs in Proper Person Pursuant to NRAP 46b. | 07-14463 | |
07/17/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners Response Brief to Defendants/Real Parties in Interest Tracey O'Reilly Kohlrautz and Christopher J. Weber's Answers to the Writ of Mandamus. | 07-15506 | |
08/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Leave to File Papers in Proper Person. fn8[We direct the clerk of this court to return unfiled Weber's proposed answer, received on July 2, 2007, and to unfile and return Weber's July 2, 2007 appendix. This court will disregard petitioners' July 17, 2007 reply.] | 07-18182 | |
09/11/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court ot vacate its March 29, 2007 order that cancelled real parties in interest's notices of lis pendens on the requirement that proceeds from any sale from the parcels at issue be deposited in an attorney trust account or with the court. The writ shall further direct the court to enter an order unconditionally cancelling real parties in interests' lis pendens recorded on the parcels at issue in this case. Finally, the writ shall direct the court to comply with NRS 33.010 and NRCP 65 in considering and issuing any preliminary injunction requested in this case." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-19969 | |
09/11/2007 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Lawrence J. Semenza for service upon Judge Jackie Glass. | 07-19986 | |
09/24/2007 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Jackie Glass on September 14, 2007. | 07-19986 | |
10/09/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-20361 | |
10/09/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |