Case Information: 49459 | |||
Short Caption: | SLETTEN VS. NAVELLIER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40662 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0202136 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/06/2007 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/16/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hale, Lane firm - check no. 078394. | ||
05/16/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10893 | |
06/01/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-12045 | |
06/06/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. | 07-12304 | |
07/09/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-14895 | |
09/13/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-20228 | |
09/19/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-20632 | |
09/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy Order/Judgment filed in district court on January 9, 2007 (filed via fax). | 07-20696 | |
09/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: January 12, 2007 (filed via fax). | 07-20697 | |
09/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 07-21077 | |
10/03/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/5/07. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. | 07-21847 | |
10/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 07-22299 | |
10/18/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 04/05/07. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. | 07-23053 | |
10/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondents' Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause why Appeal Should not be Dismissed. | 07-23297 | |
12/03/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 07-25969 | |
12/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-27348 | |
12/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2008. | 07-27348 |