Case Information: 53358 | |||
Short Caption: | SULLIVAN VS. SULLIVAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D366806 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/21/2010 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd. check no. 6333. | ||
03/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05429 | |
03/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 09-05891 | |
03/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation, however respondent's counsel is in the process of withdrawing from this matter. Settlement Judge requests an order from the court before proceeding with the settlement process. | 09-06545 | |
03/16/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06625 | |
04/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. | 09-09031 | |
07/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. This appeal is stayed pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Judicial efficiency will be best served if this appeal is dismissed without prejudice. Accordingly, "We dismiss this appeal." This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to move for reinstatement of this appeal . . . if appellant deems such a motion appropriate. NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-17149 | |
08/07/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. RECALLED PER ORDER 1/21/10 | 09-17679 | |
08/07/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/14/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 10, 2009. RECALLED PER ORDER 1/21/10 | 09-17679 | |
09/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Reinstate Appeal. | 09-23467 | |
01/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Reinstating Appeal and Assigning Appeal to Settlement Program. Appellant has filed a motion to reinstate the appeal indicating that bankruptcy proceedings have been completed. We grant the motion, recall the remittitur and reinstate this appeal. The appeal is reassigned to the settlement program. Settlement Judge; Final Status Report due 90 days. | 10-01744 | |
03/18/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Holly E. Roys, Esq. of Hanratty Law Group. | 10-07254 | |
03/24/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service by Mailing - Notice of Appearance. | 10-07694 | |
04/23/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests a 60-day extension to complete settlement proceedings. | 10-10637 | |
05/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Time for filing Final Settlement Program Status Report is extended to 6/21/10. No further extensions wll be granted. | 10-11600 | |
06/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Appellant. | 10-14047 | |
06/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Appellant. | 10-14048 | |
06/08/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Appellant on Settlement Judge. | 10-14632 | |
06/14/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-15364 | |
07/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 10 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this matter. We grant the motion to withdraw as co-counsel for appellant. The clerk shall remove attorneys Michelle A. Hauser and Shann D. Winsett, of the Pecos Law Group from the docket of this appeal. Appellant remains represented by Roger P. Croteau in this matter. | 10-18820 | |
09/01/2010 | Settlement Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. After the settlement judge reported that the parties had agreed to a settlement, this court entered an order directing appellant to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal within ten days. Appellant has not responded to our order or otherwise communicated with this court. Accordingly, cause appearing "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." | 10-22411 | |
09/27/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-24762 | |
09/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
10/12/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 5, 2010. | 10-24762 |