Case Information: 53348 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF JENNIFER WENSINK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56675 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2009 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition/Temporary Suspension. Petition for Temporary Suspension pursuant to SCR 102(4)(a). | 09-05243 | |
03/27/2009 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order of Temporary Suspension. "Wensink is temporarily suspended from the practice of law, pending the resolution of formal disciplinary proceedings against her." fn6-[This is our final disposition in this matter. Any new proceedings concerning Wensink shall be docketed under a new docket number.] NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-07690 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Order to Courts. (No action required) | 09-08562 | |
04/21/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-08308 | |
04/21/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur 4/21/09 addressed to Jennifer K. Wensink. Per USPS, "unclaimed, unable to forward". | 09-14230 | |
06/08/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. of Compliance. | 09-14299 |