Case Information: 53347 | |||
Short Caption: | BOWDISH (AUSTIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241842 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-05239 | |
03/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-05241 | |
03/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. Appellent Von Bowdish. | 09-06406 | |
03/13/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Not required. | 09-06550 | |
03/30/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/08/08 and 12/09/08. To Court Reporter: No court reporter/recorder specified. | 09-07871 | |
03/31/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Documents. Rough Draft Transcript Request Form and Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | 09-08087 | |
04/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File and Serve Opening Brief and Appendix. | 09-08763 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 09-09233 | |
04/21/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 4/13/09 addressed to Marchese Law Offices. Per USPS "attempted, not known". Per the TRF filed 3/30/09, the address has been updated and the Order was remailed to the new address and faxed to counsel. | 09-09968 | |
05/15/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Richard L. Kangas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/8/08, 12/9/08, 1/26/09. | 09-12065 | |
06/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. We vacate the March 31, 2009 order to file documents. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days, or Fast Track Statement and Appendix or Motion due: 10 days. | 09-14401 | |
07/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File and Serve Opening Brief and Appendix. | 09-17933 | |
08/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Vacating Sanction. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on July 6, 2009. We vacate the sanction imposed in our June 9, 2009, order. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. | 09-19272 | |
08/07/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-16525 | |
08/07/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-16529 | |
08/27/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-20951 | |
08/27/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-20952 | |
12/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-29201 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30299 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. | 09-30299 |