Case Information: 53337 | |||
Short Caption: | LOPEZ-SANCHEZ (FRANCISCO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C247613 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. LOPEZ-SANCHEZ - C247613 for FRANCISCO LOPEZ-SANCHEZ, Defendant | 09-05097 | |
02/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/06/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/23/08. | 09-05843 | |
03/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-05877 | |
03/17/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/5/09. | 09-06697 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanctions of $500 due: 15 days, or Request for Rough Draft Transcript Request Form due: 10 days.ays. | 09-07933 | |
03/30/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/23/08 and 2/05/09. Court Reporters: Michelle Ramsey/Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 2/25/09. | 09-08003 | |
03/31/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/23/08 and 2/05/09. Court Reporters: Michelle Ramsey/Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 2/25/09. | 09-08092 | |
04/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) Days. | 09-08878 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 7, 2009. | 09-09236 | |
05/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Extension of One (1) Day to File Fast Track Statement. | 09-11382 | |
05/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted in Eflex on May 12, 2009. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. | 09-11970 | |
05/14/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-11982 | |
05/14/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-11983 | |
06/04/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-14112 | |
06/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-14113 | |
07/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-18046 | |
08/18/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-18456 | |
08/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2009. | 09-18456 |