judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANGEL (RANDALL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53338
Short Caption:ANGEL (RANDALL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49826 , 54154
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070798Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/12/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/26/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-05098
03/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 09-05765
06/12/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 09-14652
06/12/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/12/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. 09-14653
03/10/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 10-06261
04/06/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-07869
04/06/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. 10-07869