Case Information: 53283 | |||
Short Caption: | ALMASE VS. BOCK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D265594 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/23/2009 / Gaston, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Heidi Almase - money order 08-997583804. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04203 | |
02/23/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston | 09-04610 | |
02/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. for Exemption from Settlement Program Pursuant to NRAP 16(a) and Request for Clarification of Submission of Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(a). | 09-04906 | |
02/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion for Exemption from Settlement Conference/Clarification of Submission of Docketing Statement. | 09-04917 | |
03/04/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Motion for Exemption from Settlement Program Pursuant to NRAP 16(a) and Request for Clarification of Submission of Docketing Statement Pursuant to NRAP 14(a) Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-05535 | |
03/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In regard to appellant's "Motion for Exemption from Settlement Program . . . And Request for Clarification of Submission of Docketing Statement . . ." Any request to remove an appeal from the settlement conference program should be addressed to the assigned settlement judge. This appeal was properly assigned to the settlement conference program. Fn1[To the extent appellant's motion requests removal of this appeal from the settlement conference program, we deny the motion]. Settlement judge may recommend removal if appeal not appropriate for mediation. Settlement Judge: ECAR due 3/25/09. Appellant: 15 days to file docketing statement. | 09-05558 | |
03/06/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled when appellant's motion for exemption from the settlement conference program has been resolved. | 09-05827 | |
03/06/2009 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten and not fastened or bound. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. | 09-05833 | |
03/11/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 09-06241 | |
03/11/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/12/08 (Receipt of Copy). | 09-06248 | |
03/12/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 18, 2009. | 09-06356 | |
03/16/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06576 | |
03/23/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/6/09 | 09-07274 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 6/12/09 | 09-10959 | |
06/15/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-14819 | |
06/15/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 09-14820 | |
06/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH | 09-15538 | |
06/23/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |