Case Information: 53282 | |||
Short Caption: | THE EL-AD GROUP VS. TAMARES LAS VEGAS PROPERTIES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52831 , 52955 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A546046 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/19/2009 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Morris Pickering & Oeterson check no. 27417. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04196 | |
02/19/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian | 09-04306 | |
02/25/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/13/09 | 09-04912 | |
03/02/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-05225 | |
06/03/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-13896 | |
06/29/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. 52831, 52955, 53282. The parties' NY counsel are still working through the final trademark issues on potential settlement. Request another 30 days to resolve these issues.: | 09-15978 | |
07/27/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Michelle M. Graham as Counsel for Appellant. | 09-18283 | |
09/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. The settlement judge shall file the Final Status Report within 30 days from the date of this order. 52831/52955/53282 | 09-21885 | |
10/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeals and Remand Case for Entry of Order Approving Settlement By the District Court. Nos. 52831/52955/53282. | 09-25012 | |
10/16/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-25329 | |
10/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. and Remanding to the District Court. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "we dismiss these related appeals." This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings as necessary for the parties to fulfill the terms of their settlement agreement. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, the parties may file a motion to reinstate these appeals. 52831, 52922, 53282 NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-25866 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27716 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. | 09-27716 |