Case: 23-0438
23-0438
06/09/2023
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CITY OF HOUSTON
ADAEZE SHAVON MEKA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2023 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the City of Houston. | |||||
10/02/2023 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Adaeze Shavon Meka. | |||||
06/09/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Houston. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2023 | Reply to Response | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the City of Houston. | ||||||
10/18/2023 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due no later than October 20, 2023. |
| ||||
10/17/2023 | Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Houston. | ||||||
10/03/2023 | Call received | Call received from Respondent regarding Response filed. | | |||||
10/02/2023 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Adaeze Shavon Meka. | ||||||
09/11/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Response is due no later than October 2, 2023. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Adaeze Shavon Meka. | ||||||
08/11/2023 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response requested to Petition for Review. Response is due September 11, 2023. |
| |||||
07/11/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
06/12/2023 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
06/12/2023 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
06/09/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Houston. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/11/2023 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Meka, Adaeze Shavon | Respondent | Daniel Dinneen Mr. Willie D. Powells III Mr. Brian S. Humphrey II Jay Benton Matte |
City of Houston | Petitioner | Mr. Donald B. Hightower Jaqueline I. Leguizamon Ms. Suzanne R. Chauvin Mr. Arturo G. Michel |
Ward, Jamarcus | Other interested party | Ciro Samperi Mr. Bernardino Agosto Jr. Spencer Speed |
Closure, Christopher John | Other interested party | Mr. Bernardino Agosto Jr. Ciro Samperi Spencer Speed |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-22-00002-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 04-25-23
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Amparo Monique Guerra
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
Honorable Michael Paul Gomez
2018-76033