judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE SEASONS II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS. WB, THE BUILDING CO., LLC

Case Information: 53302
Short Caption:THE SEASONS II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS. WB, THE BUILDING CO., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 08RP000031BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/26/2009 / Weise, CathySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/19/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Holland & Hart LLP check no. 67001804.
02/19/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-04356
02/26/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise 09-05072
03/04/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-05541
03/17/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is yet to be determined. 09-06779
03/31/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 5/20/09 09-08133
06/05/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The formal agreement has been circulated for execution, awaiting performance. Report to be updated within 30 days. 09-14200
07/08/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Stipulation to dismiss should be filed within 30 days. 09-16807
07/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. 09-17916
07/22/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 09-17955
07/28/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 09-18362
07/28/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.