judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REDEAUX VS. K&R HOMES, LLC

Case Information: 53284
Short Caption:REDEAUX VS. K&R HOMES, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51844
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800139Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/23/2009 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/03/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/18/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Randolph Careton Wright check no. 022007.
02/18/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-04206
02/23/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen 09-04606
02/23/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 09-04690
03/06/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-05839
03/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement 09-05840
03/16/2009Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 09-06589
04/16/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-09595
04/24/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 09-10279
05/18/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 09-12333
05/26/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 09-13024
07/13/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 21, 2009. 09-17185
08/21/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-20454
08/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-2. 09-20455
09/18/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 21, 2009. 09-22737
10/21/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Respondent Sierra Barajas Roofing's Joinder in Answering Brief. 09-25745
10/21/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents K & R Homes, LLC, Reynen & Bardis Development (Nevada), LLC and Reynen & Bardis Communities, Inc.'s Answering Brief. 09-25769
10/22/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Fleet Heating and Air. 09-25850
11/19/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. 09-28247
12/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Answering Brief and Disapproving as Moot Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Answering brief of Express Plumbing due 10 days. 09-29541
12/11/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Express Plumbing Without Prejudice. 09-30085
12/21/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Disapproving Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal in Part. The parties may file a revised stipulation, if desired, within 15 days from the date of this order. 09-30807
12/30/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -Letter from Randolph C. Wright regarding the reply brief. 09-31539
12/31/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent Express Plumbing's Motion for Extention of Time for Filing Joinder in Answering Brief (First Request) 09-31644
01/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Briefing. The clerk of this court shall file the joinder, received in this court on December 31, 2009. We direct the clerk of this court to file the reply brief received in this court on December 30, 2009. 10-02119
01/26/2010BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Respondent Express Plumbing's Joinder in Answering Brief. 09-31616
01/26/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-31541
02/18/2010MotionFiled Motion. Counsel for Respondent - Sierra Barajas Roofing. 10-04409
03/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Fn1 [We defer ruling on the motion to withdrw currently pending in this appeal.] 10-05566
03/03/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/10/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1[Counsel for respondent Sierra Barajas Roofing, Inc. filed a motion to withdraw as counsel on February 18, 2010, but failed to serve Sierra with the motion. As a result, we decline to rule on the motion. In light of our resolution of this appeal, it also appears that the motion may be moot.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-06199
04/05/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-06769
04/05/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. 10-06769