judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IGNACIO (CLIFTON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53317
Short Caption:IGNACIO (CLIFTON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR082355Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Ignacio, Defendant 09-04822
02/24/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/25/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-04943
03/04/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. 09-05575
03/10/2009MotionFiled Motion. Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Presentence Investigation Report Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR08-2355. 09-06107
03/11/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Rough Draft Transcript at Public Expense. (Filed in district court on 2/25/09). 09-06202
03/12/2009MotionFiled Motion. Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Risk Assessment Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR08-2355.. 09-06350
03/12/2009MotionFiled Motion. Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Psycho Sexual Evaluation Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR08-2355. 09-06353
03/13/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/21/08. 09-06520
03/20/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to File Transcript Request Form and Granting Motions. Transcript Request Form due: 5 days. Presentence Report, Psychosexual Evalutation and Risk Assessment due: 20 days. 09-07050
03/25/2009Other Other. Filed Presentence Investigation (PSI) Report with Attached Psychosexual Risk Assessment. (SEALED). 09-07524
03/25/2009Other Other. Filed Confidential Risk Assessment. (SEALED). 09-07525
04/06/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 09-08636
04/06/2009AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 09-08637
04/27/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 09-10437
01/07/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment ofconviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings before a distrcit court judge consistent with this order." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. 10-00421
02/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-02463
02/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 18, 2010. 10-02463