Case Information: 55112 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITE VS. SEIFF | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49852 , 54437 , 56035 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A538112 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/28/2009 / Tanksley, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-30980 | |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
12/23/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christensen Law. Check No. 18704. | ||
12/28/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley | 09-31341 | |
01/08/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Robert Eisenberg (Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg). | 10-00660 | |
01/20/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-01579 | |
01/25/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The settlement judge requests two more weeks to complete the premediation conference. | 10-01975 | |
02/01/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. | 10-02730 | |
02/05/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. | 10-03392 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 10-05360 | |
03/11/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/05/09 to 10/21/09. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. | 10-06531 | |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 10-06670 | |
03/31/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal. | 10-08387 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11837 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12624 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. | 10-12624 |