Case Information: 55111 | |||
Short Caption: | ELDER (JOSHUA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR090518 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-30976 | |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/22/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-30977 | |
01/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debora Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/14/09. | 10-00654 | |
01/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/01/09. | 10-00667 | |
01/14/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lesley Clarkson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/13/09. | 10-01181 | |
02/01/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: February 8, 2010. | 10-02674 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/13/09, 7/14/09 (L. Clarkson, D. Cecere), 12/1/09 (G. Willsey) Filed in district court on: 12/18/09. | 10-02801 | |
02/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-03487 | |
02/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Fast track statement and appendix due: March 10, 2010. | 10-03663 | |
03/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion for Extension of Time. (30) days. | 10-06253 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Fast track statement and appendix due April 9, 2010. | 10-06528 | |
04/09/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-09298 | |
04/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume I | 10-09301 | |
04/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume II | 10-09303 | |
04/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume III | 10-09302 | |
04/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave of Court to File Fast Track Response in Excess of Ten Pages. (11) pages. | 10-11037 | |
04/29/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Fast Track Response. (11) pages granted. | 10-11038 | |
04/29/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-11039 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-23077 | |
10/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25574 | |
10/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25574 |