Case Information: 53321 | |||
Short Caption: | BELL VS. AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INS. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53853 , 54090 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A528013 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/25/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christensen Law - check no. 16512. | ||
02/25/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04948 | |
02/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 09-05131 | |
03/20/2009 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. Filed per order of 4/6/09. | 09-07062 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days Appellant Bell. | 09-07332 | |
03/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-07554 | |
04/02/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/14/08; 9/29/08; 11/19/08; and 12/15/08. To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. | 09-08378 | |
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file docketing statement. | 09-08642 | |
04/06/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07062 | |
04/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-09779 | |
04/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. | 09-10487 | |
05/05/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/14/08 and 11/19/08. | 09-11148 | |
06/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-14435 | |
07/07/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-16553 | |
07/07/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2009. | 09-16553 |