judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Dabrett Montreal Black v. The State of Texas

Case: 13-22-00147-CR
13-22-00147-CR
04/07/2022
Capital Murder
Dabrett Montreal Black
The State of Texas
No
10th Court of Appeals
04/07/2022
10-22-00071-CR
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
04/07/2022
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
05/30/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/13/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/03/2024Petition for discretionary review filed
11/22/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
11/14/2023Letter filed
11/02/2023Retention time case file will be retained
11/02/2023Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/13/2023Submitted
09/01/2023Email sent
08/03/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
07/18/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
07/13/2023Set for submission on oral argument
05/30/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART
03/14/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/13/2023Case ready to be set
02/13/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/08/2023Telephone call received
01/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
01/10/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/22/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
12/06/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/03/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
10/03/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/12/2022Exhibits filed
08/30/2022Corrected document requested
08/29/2022Reporters record filed
08/19/2022Exhibits filed
08/08/2022Exhibits filed
08/08/2022Exhibits filed
08/08/2022Corrected document requested
08/08/2022Exhibits filed
08/08/2022Exhibits filed
08/04/2022Corrected document requested
08/04/2022Exhibits filed
08/04/2022Exhibits filed
07/21/2022Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
07/21/2022Extension of time to file reporters record filed
07/18/2022Exhibits filed
07/18/2022Exhibits filed
07/18/2022Exhibits filed
07/18/2022Reporters record filed
06/08/2022Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
06/08/2022Extension of time to file reporters record filed
05/09/2022Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
05/09/2022Extension of time to file reporters record filed
04/21/2022Clerks record filed
04/21/2022Docketing statement filed
04/19/2022Corrected document requested
04/07/2022Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/07/2022Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
03/17/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
03/17/2022Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/10/2022Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/2024Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Michael Brian Evans
Hon. Lisa Tanner
Black, Dabrett MontrealCriminal - AppellantHon. Stan Schwieger
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Freestone
Honorable Deborah Oakes Evans
18-030-CR
Sherry D. Current
Life without parole TDCJ