Case Information: 53306 | |||
Short Caption: | COOKS (BILLY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53467 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228670 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-04522 | |
02/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Order Suspending Briefing. Order due 30 days. | 09-05108 | |
03/10/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/25/09. Judgment of Conviction. | 09-06127 | |
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. We conclude we have jurisdiction over this appeal and briefing may proceed. Appellant: 10 days to file transcript request form and proof of service of the transcript request form. 50 days to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 09-07051 | |
04/03/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. Appellant Cooks. | 09-08418 | |
04/09/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/25/08, 1/8/08. Court Reporter: Rene Benson. Filed in district court on: 4/6/09. | 09-08949 | |
05/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-11428 | |
05/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Fast track Statement and Appendix due June 5, 2009. | 09-11802 | |
06/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. | 09-14166 | |
06/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Court reporter Bill Nelson's certificate of delivery due: 20 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days. | 09-14471 | |
06/23/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 6/10/09 addressed to Rene Benson. Per USPS, "attempted-not known, unable to forward." | 09-15541 | |
07/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Transcripts. Court Reporter Bill Nelson's certificate of delivery due: 10 days. | 09-16757 | |
07/27/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/25/08; 12/2/08; 1/8/09; and 2/3/09. | 09-18277 | |
07/29/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-18519 | |
08/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 31, 2009. | 09-19262 | |
08/31/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-21199 | |
08/31/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-21201 | |
09/18/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-22708 | |
09/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-23065 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Fn1[Cooks asks this court to adopt the federal standards pertaining to presentence motions to withdraw which, he claims, are more liberally granted. We decline Cooks' invitation.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-00565 | |
02/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-02365 | |
02/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2010. | 10-02365 |