judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAPITAL GROWTH, LLC VS. BRAVO

Case Information: 53323
Short Caption:CAPITAL GROWTH, LLC VS. BRAVOCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50311 , 50970
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A536644Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/05/2009 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Perkins Law Group, LLC check no. 1066.
02/26/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-05003
03/03/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers and his Alter Egos, Captial Growth, LLC & Capital Growth, C.A. 09-05366
03/05/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian 09-05707
03/17/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondents' Notice of Appellants' Failure to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Respondents' Motion to Remove the Appeal of Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers and his Alter Egos, Capital Growth, LLC & Capital Growth, C.A., from the NRAP 16 Settlement Program. 09-06719
03/23/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07312
03/23/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 09-07313
03/30/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/24/09 09-07922
04/30/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondents' Response to Request for Further Delays by Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers. 09-10717
04/30/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Respondents' Response to Request for Further Delays by Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers. 09-10725
05/05/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Respondents' Response to Request for Further Delays by Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers. 09-11136
05/11/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. 53323 and 53326. This appeal should be exempt from the program. All principals of appellants are in Mexico and are unwilling to appear personally in Las Vegas, and thus no fruitful settlement discussions can occur. 09-11512
05/11/2009Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. 53323 and 53326. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Briefing and requesting of transcripts shall remain suspended. Fn1[in light of the settlement judge's report, we deny as moot respondents' 3/17/09 motion filed in Docket No. 53323 to remove that appeal from the settlement conference program.] 09-11586
05/22/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to the Perkins Law Group, LLc's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel fo Record for Appellants. 09-12779
05/22/2009MotionFiled Motion. The Perkins Law Group, LLC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellants. 09-12855
05/28/2009Other Returned Mail. Notice issued 4/30/09 addressed to the Perkins Law Group. Per phone conversation with Cami Perkins, the address is correct. Remailed to same address. 09-13338
05/29/2009Other Returned Mail. Settlement conference status report filed 5/11/09 addressed to the Perkins Law Group. Remailed to same address. 09-13342
06/11/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Request for Expedited Decision on Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers. 09-14555
06/11/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Representing Appellants Hutchison & Steffen, LLC. in the place and stead of The Perkins Law Group, LLC. 09-14584
06/15/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Request for Expedited Decision on Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Appeal of Kerry Rogers. 09-14784
06/15/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. 09-14788
06/22/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Motion by Appellant, Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 09-15415
06/22/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellants' Notice of Potential Grounds for Recusal of Justice Cherry. 09-15465
06/24/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Response to Appellants' Notice of Potential Grounds for Recusal of Justice Cherry. 09-15614
07/07/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondents' Notice that on June 29, 2009, the District Court Denied Appellant Kerry Rogers' Request to Stay Contempt Portion of Judgment. 09-16636
11/25/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Certain Motions. No action will be taken on respondents' April 30 filing. No further action will be taken on Rogers' May 12 letter. On June 11, 2009, attorney Michael K. Wall, of the law firm Hutchison & Steffen, LLC, filed a stipulation to substitute for attorney Perkins as the counsel of record for appellants. We approve the stipulation and deny as moot the May 22 motion requesting permission to withdraw. As Justice Cherry has voluntarily recused himself from this appeal, the June 22 notice is moot. fn1[ We defer ruling on respondents' March 3, 2009, motion to dismiss the appeal, respondents' June 11, 2009, motion requesting an expedited decision on their motion to dismiss this appeal, and appellants' June 15, 2009, motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss.] 09-28810
11/25/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. fn1[ We defer ruling on respondents' March 3, 2009, motion to dismiss the appeal, respondents' June 11, 2009, motion requesting an expedited decision on their motion to dismiss this appeal, and appellants' June 15, 2009, motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss.] 09-28812
12/23/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant. 09-31127
01/08/2010MotionFiled Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents Response To Order To Show Cause 10-00616
01/29/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Respondents' Reply to Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (Response to Reply is attached as an exhibit). DETACHED AND FILED ATTACHED RESPONSE PER ORDER 02/12/10. 10-02530
02/03/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion For Leave To File Additional Response to Order to Show Cause. 10-02888
02/12/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach and file the proposed response attached to appellants' January 29, 2010, motion. 10-03904
02/12/2010MotionFiled Reply to Response. Response to Respondents' Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 10-03907
03/30/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP fn2[ We grant appellants' June 15, 2009, motion, opposed by respondents, for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss, and we direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' opposition and stay motion, provisionally received by this court on July 23, 2009, and respondents' opposition thereto, provisionally received on July 31, 2009.] fn3[In light of this order, we do not reach the separate jurisdictional issue raised in our November 25, 2009, show cause order. We also deny appellants' stay motion and respondents' motion for an expedited decision as moot.] 10-08288
03/30/2010MotionFiled Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Limited Stay of Contempt Sentence Portion of Judgment. 09-18060
03/30/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Motion by Appellant, Contemnor and Fugitive Kerry Rogers to "Stay" the District Court's 1/25/08 Contempt Judgment. 09-18729
04/26/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-08599
04/26/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/04/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 29, 2010. 10-08599