Case: 02-22-00416-CV
02-22-00416-CV
10/26/2022
Forcible entry & detainer
Kathleen Kim Yen Nabors
Dian Properties LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/20/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
07/19/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
06/26/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
05/23/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
05/19/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
04/11/2023 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
04/05/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
04/04/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
04/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/31/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/24/2023 | Document Received |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/09/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/08/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/08/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/07/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
01/02/2023 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/15/2022 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/16/2022 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/09/2022 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/26/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/17/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Nabors, Kathleen Kim Yen | Appellant | Kathleen Kim Yen Nabors |
Dian Properties LLC | Appellee | Michael D. Payma |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Denton
Honorable Robert Ramirez
CV-2022-02275-JP
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 2, Denton County