Case Information: 53316 | |||
Short Caption: | MORRIS (ROGER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR082058 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Morris, Defendant | 09-04821 | |
02/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/25/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 09-04945 | |
02/26/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/20/08, 10/23/08, 12/30/08, 01/05/09, 01/23/09, and 01/27/09. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. Not filed in district court. | 09-05093 | |
03/06/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cecilia Vohl stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/15/08, 12/17/08, and 12/31/08. | 09-05841 | |
03/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Presentence Investigation Report Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR08-2058. | 09-06106 | |
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. District Court Clerk: 20 days to file the presentence report in case no. CR08-2058. | 09-07052 | |
03/25/2009 | Other | Other. Filed Presentence Investigation (PSI) Report. (SEALED). | 09-07523 | |
03/27/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 13, 2009. | 09-07795 | |
04/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-08447 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 13, 2009. | 09-09227 | |
04/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/21/09. | 09-09239 | |
05/14/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-12015 | |
05/14/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 09-12016 | |
05/21/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-12684 | |
07/31/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-18708 | |
08/25/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-19179 | |
08/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2009. | 09-19179 |