Case Information: 53307 | |||
Short Caption: | RISKO VS. KIEFER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV26678 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/25/2009 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Galliher Law Firm check no. 21518. | ||
02/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04527 | |
02/25/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 09-04859 | |
02/27/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-05121 | |
02/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | 09-05123 | |
03/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-05848 | |
03/26/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/2/09 | 09-07642 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-13128 | |
06/15/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-14779 | |
06/25/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-15733 | |
06/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Certificate of No Transcript. Due date: 10 days. | 09-15734 | |
06/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 09-15821 | |
07/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Certificate of No Transcript. | 09-16246 | |
07/16/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The settlement judge reports that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Attached is a letter from appellants' counsel reporting that a stipulation to dismiss the appeal will be filed shortly. | 09-17475 | |
07/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 15 days. | 09-17762 | |
08/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-18882 | |
08/11/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP | 09-19578 | |
08/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
08/17/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-19930 |