Case Information: 49428 | |||
Short Caption: | BRASS TACKS VS. DIST. CT. (FRAYN) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A503122 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Parraguirre | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Parraguirre | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Selman Breitman, LLP--check no. 2139. | ||
05/14/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-10569 | |
05/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Defendants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Application for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-10570 | |
05/14/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Law firm of Harrison Kemp & Jones, LLP. | ||
05/15/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. (1) Proof of service on the respondent district judge. NRAP 21(a). 2) A copy of the judgment or order challenged by the petition. NRAP 21(a). "Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Contradicting Defendants' Prior Admissions" filed in the district court on 05/08/07. Due Date: 10 days. | 07-10766 | |
05/15/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Elaine K. Fresch regarding the Motion for Stay (filed via fax). | 07-10781 | |
05/22/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. in response to our notice issued on 05/15/07. | 07-11297 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." fn4[We deny as moot petitioners' request for a stay.] NNP07-WM/JH/NS | 07-12533 | |
07/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-13555 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |