judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

William Francis and Incline Energy Partners, L.P. v. Phoenix Capital Group Holdings, LLC

Case: 05-22-01260-CV
05-22-01260-CV
11/23/2022
Damages
William Francis and Incline Energy Partners, L.P.
Phoenix Capital Group Holdings, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
06/05/2023Supplemental brief filedAppellee
05/24/2023Supplemental brief filedAppellant
03/17/2023Reply brief filedAppellant
02/28/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/08/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
12/29/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/2023Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
12/28/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court
12/22/2023Mandate due to be issued
11/21/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/2023Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court
10/11/2023Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/29/2023Motion for rehearing filed
09/29/2023Motion for rehearing due
09/14/2023Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/2023Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed
08/29/2023Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Affirmed in Part
08/29/2023Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/05/2023Supplemental brief filed
06/03/2023Supplemental brief due
05/24/2023Supplemental brief filed
05/24/2023Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
05/17/2023Submitted
05/11/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
05/11/2023Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
03/17/2023Reply brief filed
03/14/2023Set for submission on oral argument
02/28/2023Case ready to be set
02/28/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/28/2023Appellees brief due
02/08/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/08/2023Appellants brief due
01/25/2023Amended notice of appeal filed
01/25/2023Amended notice of appeal filed
01/08/2023Appellants brief due
01/06/2023Letter filed
12/23/2022Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/19/2022Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
12/09/2022No reporters record filed in civil case
12/07/2022Electronic Clerks Record Filed
12/03/2022Record due
11/28/2022Fee paid
11/28/2022Docketing statement filed
11/23/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
11/23/2022Fee requested
11/23/2022Docketing statement due
11/23/2022Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
11/09/2022Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/2029RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
12/28/2023Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Phoenix Capital Group Holdings, LLCAppelleeJames O. Crewse  
William Francis, et al. AppellantCharlene C. Koonce  
Cortney C. Thomas
Andrew C. Debter
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tonya Parker
DC-22-06350
Lanetta J. Williams