Case Information: 53300 | |||
Short Caption: | DAHL VS. BEAU RIVAGE RESORTS, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A512447 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/26/2009 / Nitz, Dana | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Daniel Marks check no. 13435. | ||
02/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04348 | |
02/26/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Nitz | 09-05070 | |
03/09/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-05910 | |
03/18/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 19, 2009. | 09-06892 | |
09/01/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-21275 | |
09/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 15 days. | 09-22259 | |
09/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice | 09-22828 | |
09/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-23394 | |
09/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |