Case: 01-24-00173-CV
01-24-00173-CV
03/01/2024
Contract
Robert P. Padula
Brandon Davis and Swan Energy, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/2024 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
03/04/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
03/01/2024 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
03/01/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/01/2024 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/05/2024 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brandon Davis and Swan Energy, Inc. | Appellee | George Henry Rau III Rachael Stuhr |
Padula , Robert P. | Appellant | Charles Chad Baruch Coyt Randy Johnston |
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 334th District Court
2020-40525
Susan Miller