Case Information: 53296 | |||
Short Caption: | WALKER (CALVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51762 , 55353 , 56160 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C240431 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/22/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-04330 | |
03/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-05741 | |
04/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to consolidate. We direct the clerk of this court to file the motions. Nos. 51762/53296. | 09-08477 | |
04/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. to consolidate. Nos. 51762/53296. | 09-08214 | |
05/22/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 55353 PER ORDER FILED 03/17/10 | 09-12877 | |
05/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/04/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03110 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04250 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04250 | |
03/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. This court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 53296 to Docket No. 55353. Supplemental Record in No. 55353 due: 30 days. Nos. 55353/53296 (10-07024). |