Case Information: 53311 | |||
Short Caption: | HILL (CHARLES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50238 , 53530 , 54672 , 54920 , 55071 , 59646 , 63946 , 65268 , 65931 , 68876 , 71068 , 71068-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C068816 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/23/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/23/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-04697 | |
03/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days ( Notice of Entry - 1/7/09) | 09-05213 | |
03/05/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 09-05607 | |
03/05/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 09-05609 | |
03/11/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 7, 2009. Notice of Entry of Decision and Order. | 09-06259 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-07951 | |
04/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-08425 | |
04/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/11/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 28, 2009. | 09-08425 |