Case: 05-23-00701-CV
05-23-00701-CV
07/13/2023
Contract
Hendolph Holdings LLC, Christopher Randolph, and Henda Salmeron
Dean Caldwell, Linda Caldwell, Airmaster Aerator, LLC, and Airmaster Environmental. LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/16/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
10/30/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
09/08/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/05/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
09/05/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
09/04/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
08/31/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
07/26/2023 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
07/25/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
07/23/2023 | Record due | | |||||
07/19/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
07/14/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
07/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/13/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
06/23/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/05/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
11/16/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dean Caldwell, et al. | Appellee | J. Kent Davenport Leonard A. Epstein |
Hendolph Holdings LLC, et al. | Appellant | Brian M. Gillett David C. Miller William S. Snyder Royce B. West Emily A. Webb |
Christopher Randolph and Henda Salmeron | Appellant | Craig A. Capua |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Martin Hoffman
DC-22-09850
Antionette Reagor